THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:44:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 54
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-7765
Fax: (613) 623-0841

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.H. Rivington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rivington (CPSO#: 61877 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 54
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-7765
Fax: (613) 623-0841

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.H. Rivington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rivington (CPSO#: 61877 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER HELEN RIVINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVINGTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER HELEN RIVINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVINGTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Mar 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 1990