THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:00:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4520 Colonel Talbot Road
London Ontario N6P 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 652-2141
Fax: (519) 652-2138

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 22 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Lacerte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lacerte (CPSO#: 61912 )
Business Address: 4520 Colonel Talbot Road
London Ontario N6P 1B6
(519) 652-2141

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4520 Colonel Talbot Road
London Ontario N6P 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 652-2141
Fax: (519) 652-2138

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 22 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Lacerte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lacerte (CPSO#: 61912 )
Business Address: 4520 Colonel Talbot Road
London Ontario N6P 1B6
(519) 652-2141

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHEL LACERTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACERTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHEL LACERTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACERTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 1990