THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:18:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room W1650 Orthopaedics
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8774
Fax: (613) 737-8837

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 08 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul R. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kim (CPSO#: 61962 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room W1650 Orthopaedics
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8774

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room W1650 Orthopaedics
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8774
Fax: (613) 737-8837

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 08 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul R. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kim (CPSO#: 61962 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room W1650 Orthopaedics
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8774

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ROY KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ROY KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990