THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4256 Bathurst Street
400
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-633-0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 405-4060 Rue Sainte-Catherine
Cloud Medical
Montréal Québec H3Z 2Z3
Phone: 514 788 1785
Fax: 514 788 1786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 29 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. YANOFSKY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yanofsky (CPSO#: 61963 )
Business Address: unit 1110-111 Saint Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4V 1N5
5147052982

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4256 Bathurst Street
400
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-633-0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 405-4060 Rue Sainte-Catherine
Cloud Medical
Montréal Québec H3Z 2Z3
Phone: 514 788 1785
Fax: 514 788 1786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 29 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. YANOFSKY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yanofsky (CPSO#: 61963 )
Business Address: unit 1110-111 Saint Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4V 1N5
5147052982

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD YANOFSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANOFSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD YANOFSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANOFSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1990