THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:04:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Paediatric Surgery
1200 Main Street West
suite 4E8
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75244
Fax: (905) 521-9992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helene Flageole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Flageole (CPSO#: 62007 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Paediatric General Surgery
1200 Main Street West
Suite 4E8
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75244
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Paediatric Surgery
1200 Main Street West
suite 4E8
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75244
Fax: (905) 521-9992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric General Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helene Flageole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Flageole (CPSO#: 62007 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Paediatric General Surgery
1200 Main Street West
Suite 4E8
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75244
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENE FLAGEOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAGEOLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENE FLAGEOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAGEOLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 1990