THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:57:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
10th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 34334
Fax: (905) 540-6595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clara Cebrian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cebrian (CPSO#: 62034 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East 10th Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 34334

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
10th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 34334
Fax: (905) 540-6595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clara Cebrian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cebrian (CPSO#: 62034 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East 10th Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 34334

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLARA TERESA CEBRIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEBRIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLARA TERESA CEBRIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEBRIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990