THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:00:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 305
240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough Ontario M1V 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 321-6001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Diu-Wick Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam (CPSO#: 62054 )
Business Address: 305 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough Ontario M1V 3Z3
(416) 321-6001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 305
240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough Ontario M1V 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 321-6001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Diu-Wick Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam (CPSO#: 62054 )
Business Address: 305 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough Ontario M1V 3Z3
(416) 321-6001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID DIU-WICK LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID DIU-WICK LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990