THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ranchi University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Director - Pediatric Critical Care
C2-842
Children's Hospital of Western Ont.
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 52245
Fax: (519) 685-8766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.N. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh (CPSO#: 62060 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Suite C2-842
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Ranchi University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Director - Pediatric Critical Care
C2-842
Children's Hospital of Western Ont.
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 52245
Fax: (519) 685-8766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.N. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh (CPSO#: 62060 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Suite C2-842
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAM NIVAS SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAM NIVAS SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ranchi University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990