THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:16:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street, Box 144
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73390
Fax: (905) 575-7320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 13 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parveen Wasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wasi (CPSO#: 62083 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street, Box 144
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73390
Fax: (905) 575-7320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 13 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parveen Wasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wasi (CPSO#: 62083 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARVEEN WASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARVEEN WASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990