THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:42:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7-225 Speers Rd
Oakville Ontario L6K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 837-1661
Fax: (905) 569-6187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chen & Sato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chen (CPSO#: 62097 ) Dr. N. Sato (CPSO#: 63581 )
Business Address: Speers Medical
7 - 225 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6K 0J4
(289) 837-1661

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7-225 Speers Rd
Oakville Ontario L6K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 837-1661
Fax: (905) 569-6187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chen & Sato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chen (CPSO#: 62097 ) Dr. N. Sato (CPSO#: 63581 )
Business Address: Speers Medical
7 - 225 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6K 0J4
(289) 837-1661

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM YUNG-HAN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM YUNG-HAN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990