THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:00:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 192 Riddell Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 8M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 537-5044
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Onishenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Onishenko (CPSO#: 62100 )
Business Address: 192 Riddell Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 8M7
(519) 537-5044

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 192 Riddell Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 8M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 537-5044
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Onishenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Onishenko (CPSO#: 62100 )
Business Address: 192 Riddell Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 8M7
(519) 537-5044

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA KATHLEEN ONISHENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONISHENKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA KATHLEEN ONISHENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONISHENKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990