THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 706-1501
Fax: (226) 706-1599

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Hoey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hoey (CPSO#: 62106 )
Business Address: 3 - 86 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1A8
(226) 706-1501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 706-1501
Fax: (226) 706-1599

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Hoey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hoey (CPSO#: 62106 )
Business Address: 3 - 86 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1A8
(226) 706-1501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ALEXANDER HOEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ALEXANDER HOEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990