THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:24:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Westway Children's Clinic
Unit 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 2Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 244-7617
Fax: (416) 244-0310

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Calpin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Calpin (CPSO#: 62108 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Westway Children's Clinic
Unit 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 2Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 244-7617
Fax: (416) 244-0310

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Calpin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Calpin (CPSO#: 62108 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE CALPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALPIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE CALPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALPIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990