THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:57:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Area Family Health Team
P.O. Box 98
6 Goshen Street South
Zurich Ontario N0M 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 236-4314
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Josephson (CPSO#: 62110 )
Business Address: 6 Goshen Street South
Zurich Ontario N0M 2T0
(519) 236-4314

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Area Family Health Team
P.O. Box 98
6 Goshen Street South
Zurich Ontario N0M 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 236-4314
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Josephson (CPSO#: 62110 )
Business Address: 6 Goshen Street South
Zurich Ontario N0M 2T0
(519) 236-4314

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH GAYLE JOSEPHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPHSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH GAYLE JOSEPHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPHSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Incapacity referral to Fitness to Practise Committee
Date of Decision: 26 Nov 1996
Summary of Decision:
On November 26, 1996, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Josephson to be an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as defined in ss.1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. Pursuant to ss.69(1) of the Code, the Committee ordered that Dr. Josephson(s certificate of registration in the Province of Ontario be suspended for an indefinite period of time and be removed only by subsequent order of the Fitness to Practise Committee.

On June 12, 2000, the Committee granted Dr. Josephson(s application to remove the suspension effective immediately.

On August 7, 2003, the Fitness to Practise vacated all terms of its order of June 12, 2000.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 26 Nov 1996

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Incapacity referral to Fitness to Practise Committee
Date of Decision: 26 Nov 1996
Summary of Decision:
On November 26, 1996, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Josephson to be an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as defined in ss.1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. Pursuant to ss.69(1) of the Code, the Committee ordered that Dr. Josephson(s certificate of registration in the Province of Ontario be suspended for an indefinite period of time and be removed only by subsequent order of the Fitness to Practise Committee.

On June 12, 2000, the Committee granted Dr. Josephson(s application to remove the suspension effective immediately.

On August 7, 2003, the Fitness to Practise vacated all terms of its order of June 12, 2000.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 26 Nov 1996

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2003
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 12 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practice Committee Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2003


DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practice Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 1996

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990