THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1160 Blair Rd
Unit C
Burlington ON L7M 1K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-331-3101
Fax: 905-319-2499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jefferey D. Lang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lang (CPSO#: 62114 )
Business Address: C-1160 Blair Rd
Burlington ON L7M 1K9
9053313101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1160 Blair Rd
Unit C
Burlington ON L7M 1K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-331-3101
Fax: 905-319-2499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jefferey D. Lang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lang (CPSO#: 62114 )
Business Address: C-1160 Blair Rd
Burlington ON L7M 1K9
9053313101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFEREY DOUGLAS LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFEREY DOUGLAS LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990