THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:07:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-382 Wellington Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 1K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193518200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Turnbull Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Turnbull (CPSO#: 62125 )
Business Address: Suite 202
857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
(519) 351-8200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-382 Wellington Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 1K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193518200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Turnbull Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Turnbull (CPSO#: 62125 )
Business Address: Suite 202
857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
(519) 351-8200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ROSS TURNBULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNBULL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ROSS TURNBULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNBULL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990