THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
Suite 206
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 438-1130
Fax: (519) 438-0861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 29 Aug 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marignani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marignani (CPSO#: 62132 )
Business Address: 206-1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 0W7
5194381130

Corporation Name: Marignani Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
Suite 206
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 438-1130
Fax: (519) 438-0861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 29 Aug 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marignani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marignani (CPSO#: 62132 )
Business Address: 206-1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 0W7
5194381130

Corporation Name: Marignani Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARILENA MARIGNANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIGNANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARILENA MARIGNANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIGNANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990