THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:18:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Address: Grand Genesis Health
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
Address: Oakridges Cosmetic Surgery Center
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 401
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 66 Avenue Road
Suite #1
Toronto Ontario M5R 2N8
Phone: (416) 922-4513
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Spa Medica
66 Avenue Road
Suite #4
Toronto Ontario M5R 3N8
Phone: (416) 922-2868
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 199 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
Phone: (416) 961-6044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Elements
195 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
Phone: (416) 929-7072
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 400-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee (CPSO#: 62140 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 6212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Address: Grand Genesis Health
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
Address: Oakridges Cosmetic Surgery Center
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 401
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 66 Avenue Road
Suite #1
Toronto Ontario M5R 2N8
Phone: (416) 922-4513
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Spa Medica
66 Avenue Road
Suite #4
Toronto Ontario M5R 3N8
Phone: (416) 922-2868
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 199 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
Phone: (416) 961-6044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Elements
195 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
Phone: (416) 929-7072
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 400-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee (CPSO#: 62140 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 6212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENDERSON LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENDERSON LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990