THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:25:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Hospital
Room F301
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-6024
Fax: (905) 540-6568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Crowther Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crowther (CPSO#: 62142 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Suite 4V32
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: F301 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-6024
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Hospital
Room F301
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-6024
Fax: (905) 540-6568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Crowther Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crowther (CPSO#: 62142 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Suite 4V32
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: F301 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-6024
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW CROWTHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWTHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW CROWTHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWTHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990