THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:20:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
186 Erie Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 4T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-0458
Fax: 705-445-2586

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Cornell MPC
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cornell (CPSO#: 62154 )
Business Address: 186 Erie Street
Suite 208
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1P6
705-444-4252

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Cornell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
186 Erie Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 4T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-0458
Fax: 705-445-2586

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Cornell MPC
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cornell (CPSO#: 62154 )
Business Address: 186 Erie Street
Suite 208
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1P6
705-444-4252

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Cornell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ANTHONY CORNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ANTHONY CORNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990