THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:20:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3920 Dominion Blvd
Windsor Ontario N9E2M2
Phone: (226) 773-6260
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Dept
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor, Ontario
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Kwong Yum Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng (CPSO#: 62182 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3920 Dominion Blvd
Windsor Ontario N9E2M2
Phone: (226) 773-6260
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Dept
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor, Ontario
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Kwong Yum Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng (CPSO#: 62182 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KWONG YUM NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KWONG YUM NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990