THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:49:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c/o Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Digestive Health Clinic
330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Swartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Swartz (CPSO#: 62188 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041
Business Address: Digestive Health Clinic
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
(905) 707-5007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c/o Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Digestive Health Clinic
330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Swartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Swartz (CPSO#: 62188 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041
Business Address: Digestive Health Clinic
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
(905) 707-5007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SOLOMON SWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWARTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SOLOMON SWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990