THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:09:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-123 Guildwood Parkway
Toronto Ontario M1E 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 269-5088
Fax: (416) 261-3112

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Wilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilton (CPSO#: 62191 )
Business Address: 112-123 Guildwood Parkway
Toronto Ontario M1E 4V2
(416) 269-5088

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-123 Guildwood Parkway
Toronto Ontario M1E 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 269-5088
Fax: (416) 261-3112

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Wilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilton (CPSO#: 62191 )
Business Address: 112-123 Guildwood Parkway
Toronto Ontario M1E 4V2
(416) 269-5088

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRUCE WILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRUCE WILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990