THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:10:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1466 Bathurst Street
#201
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 531-3331
Fax: (416) 531-1639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Peer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peer (CPSO#: 62207 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1466 Bathurst Street
#201
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 531-3331
Fax: (416) 531-1639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Peer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peer (CPSO#: 62207 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990