THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:07:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamilton-Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hamilton (CPSO#: 62212 ) Dr. D. Desai (CPSO#: 55414 )
Business Address: 875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5P1
(613) 725-2000

Corporation Name: Hamilton-Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2006

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamilton-Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hamilton (CPSO#: 62212 ) Dr. D. Desai (CPSO#: 55414 )
Business Address: 875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5P1
(613) 725-2000

Corporation Name: Hamilton-Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2006

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 May 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990