THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:23:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Cino and Cathy Candusso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Candusso (CPSO#: 62235 ) Dr. P. Cino (CPSO#: 62225 )
Business Address: Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
(519) 938-8000
Business Address: Headwaters HealthCare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 56576

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Cino and Cathy Candusso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Candusso (CPSO#: 62235 ) Dr. P. Cino (CPSO#: 62225 )
Business Address: Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
(519) 938-8000
Business Address: Headwaters HealthCare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 56576

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHRYN ANNE CANDUSSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANDUSSO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHRYN ANNE CANDUSSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANDUSSO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990