THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:46:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huron Community Family Health Team
P O Box 460
32 B Centennial Drive
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 600-2273
Fax: (519) 600-2501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Percival Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Percival (CPSO#: 62237 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huron Community Family Health Team
P O Box 460
32 B Centennial Drive
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 600-2273
Fax: (519) 600-2501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Percival Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Percival (CPSO#: 62237 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE PERCIVAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERCIVAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE PERCIVAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERCIVAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990