THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:54:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Punjabi University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 501
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 767-0995
Fax: (416) 767-0992
Address: Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M5R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Extension: 6126
Fax: (416) 530-6222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 10 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Umesh Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Jain (CPSO#: 62254 )
Business Address: 501 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 767-0995

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Punjabi University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 501
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 767-0995
Fax: (416) 767-0992
Address: Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M5R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Extension: 6126
Fax: (416) 530-6222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 10 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Umesh Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Jain (CPSO#: 62254 )
Business Address: 501 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 767-0995

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMESH JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMESH JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Punjabi University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990