THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:25:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23 Spragge Street
Manitowaning Ontario P0P 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 859-2170
Fax: (705) 859-2212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Bedard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bedard (CPSO#: 62262 )
Business Address: 23 Spragge Street
Manitowaning Ontario P0P 1N0
(705) 859-2170

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23 Spragge Street
Manitowaning Ontario P0P 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 859-2170
Fax: (705) 859-2212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Bedard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bedard (CPSO#: 62262 )
Business Address: 23 Spragge Street
Manitowaning Ontario P0P 1N0
(705) 859-2170

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN-LLOYD BEDARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN-LLOYD BEDARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990