THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-4601
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Georgetown Hospital Campus
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Phone: 4165746301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lobo (CPSO#: 62282 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L9T 2X5
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4601
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 137 Cairncroft
Oakville Ontario L6J 4L8
(905) 842-7021

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-4601
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Georgetown Hospital Campus
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Phone: 4165746301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lobo (CPSO#: 62282 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L9T 2X5
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4601
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 137 Cairncroft
Oakville Ontario L6J 4L8
(905) 842-7021

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ANTHONY LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ANTHONY LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990