THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:49:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-3699
Extension: 28
Fax: (905) 456-8768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avrum Soicher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cooper (CPSO#: 58248 ) Dr. A. Soicher (CPSO#: 62293 )
Business Address: Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
(905) 456-3699

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-3699
Extension: 28
Fax: (905) 456-8768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avrum Soicher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cooper (CPSO#: 58248 ) Dr. A. Soicher (CPSO#: 62293 )
Business Address: Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
(905) 456-3699

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVRUM ARON SOICHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOICHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVRUM ARON SOICHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOICHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 9, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Avrum Aron Soicher in respect to an incident that took place in February 2005.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 9, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Avrum Aron Soicher in respect to an incident that took place in February 2005.

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990