THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:03:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West
Suite 602
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-270-1104
Fax: 905-270-0569

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 10 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Marmor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Marmor (CPSO#: 62298 ) Dr. J. Gortler (CPSO#: 72229 )
Business Address: 602-89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West
Suite 602
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-270-1104
Fax: 905-270-0569

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 10 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Marmor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Marmor (CPSO#: 62298 ) Dr. J. Gortler (CPSO#: 72229 )
Business Address: 602-89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC MARMOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARMOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC MARMOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARMOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990