THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 485-2222
Fax: (416) 485-2276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Kestenbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kestenbaum (CPSO#: 62302 )
Business Address: 204 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
(416) 485-2222

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 485-2222
Fax: (416) 485-2276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Kestenbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kestenbaum (CPSO#: 62302 )
Business Address: 204 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
(416) 485-2222

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH SUSAN KESTENBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESTENBAUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH SUSAN KESTENBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESTENBAUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990