THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:23:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 18-246
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165868671
Fax: 4165868864

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Ginsburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ginsburg (CPSO#: 62307 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 433
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8671

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 18-246
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165868671
Fax: 4165868864

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Ginsburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ginsburg (CPSO#: 62307 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 433
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8671

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIPHRA RACHEL GINSBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBURG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIPHRA RACHEL GINSBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINSBURG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990