THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:00:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Dundas Street West
Suite 203
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-4571
Fax: (905) 668-4286

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen S. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cohen (CPSO#: 62308 )
Business Address: 220 Dundas Street West
Suite 203
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
(905) 668-4571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Dundas Street West
Suite 203
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-4571
Fax: (905) 668-4286

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen S. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cohen (CPSO#: 62308 )
Business Address: 220 Dundas Street West
Suite 203
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
(905) 668-4571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN SAUL COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN SAUL COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990