THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Cardiovascular Surgery
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3256
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-3126
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Maharajh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maharajh (CPSO#: 62312 )
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
613-738-7600 Extn: 3257
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
613-737-7600 Extn: 3257
Business Address: 170 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
613-737-7600 Extn: 3257
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-7600 Extn: 3257

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Cardiovascular Surgery
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3256
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-3126
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Maharajh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maharajh (CPSO#: 62312 )
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
613-738-7600 Extn: 3257
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
613-737-7600 Extn: 3257
Business Address: 170 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
613-737-7600 Extn: 3257
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-7600 Extn: 3257

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GYAANDEO SEUSARAN MAHARAJH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GYAANDEO SEUSARAN MAHARAJH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990