THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:43:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 707-5678
Fax: (905) 264-7310

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Osak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Osak (CPSO#: 62313 )
Business Address: Suite 302
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 707-5678
Business Address: 301-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
9057075678

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 707-5678
Fax: (905) 264-7310

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Osak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Osak (CPSO#: 62313 )
Business Address: Suite 302
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 707-5678
Business Address: 301-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
9057075678

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERTA OSAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERTA OSAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990