THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:34:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4662 Cross Rd
Inverary ON K0H 1X0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135722978
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wobeser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wobeser (CPSO#: 62351 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4662 Cross Rd
Inverary ON K0H 1X0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135722978
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wobeser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wobeser (CPSO#: 62351 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDY LEE WOBESER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOBESER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDY LEE WOBESER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOBESER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990