THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:21:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519 646-6000
Extension: 64219
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy Rice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rice (CPSO#: 62355 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519 646-6000
Extension: 64219
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy Rice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rice (CPSO#: 62355 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY MARIE RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY MARIE RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990