THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood south
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Moss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Moss (CPSO#: 62362 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
Oshawa General Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood south
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Moss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Moss (CPSO#: 62362 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
Oshawa General Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARLEY DAVID MOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARLEY DAVID MOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 29 Jul 2015
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 29 Jul 2015
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990