THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:49:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103
20 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-5290
Fax: (519) 354-9011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milkovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Milkovic (CPSO#: 62363 ) Dr. H. Milkovic (CPSO#: 56815 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103
20 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-5290
Fax: (519) 354-9011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milkovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Milkovic (CPSO#: 62363 ) Dr. H. Milkovic (CPSO#: 56815 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEKE MILKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEKE MILKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990