THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Neurophysiology
Donnelly wing, Rm 9-502
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5193
Fax: (416) 864-6095

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Midroni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Midroni (CPSO#: 62364 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Neurophysiology
9-Donnelly Wing, 9-502
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5193

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Neurophysiology
Donnelly wing, Rm 9-502
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5193
Fax: (416) 864-6095

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Midroni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Midroni (CPSO#: 62364 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Neurophysiology
9-Donnelly Wing, 9-502
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5193

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GYL MIDRONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDRONI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GYL MIDRONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDRONI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990