THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 00:33:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Ridges Medical
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 100
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mauceri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mauceri (CPSO#: 62368 )
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7759

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Ridges Medical
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 100
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mauceri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mauceri (CPSO#: 62368 )
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7759

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NELLA MAUCERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUCERI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NELLA MAUCERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUCERI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990