THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Colborne St Clinic
347 Colborne St
Brantford Ontario N3S 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 754-2893
Fax: (519) 758-0182
Address: The Brantford RAAM Clinic
2-347 Colborne St E
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
Phone: 519-758-0008
Fax: 226-401-3818
Address: 324 Colborne St
The Brantford RAAM Clinic
Brantford ON N3S 3M9
Phone: 519-758-0008
Fax: 226-401-3818
Address: 324 Colborne St
The Colborne St Clinic
Brantford ON N3S 3M9
Phone: 519-754-2893
Fax: 519-758-0182
Address: The Broad St Clinic
2nd Fl, 140 Broad St East
Dunnville Ontario N1A 1E9
Phone: 289-738-0777
Fax: 289-738-0779
Address: The New Hope Clinic
2-753 2nd Line
Ohsweken Ontario N0A 1M0
Phone: 519-445-1744
Fax: 519-445-4587
Address: The Water Street Clinic
80 Norfolk St S
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 2W2
Phone: (519) 428-4676
Fax: (519) 428-1982
Address: 32 Robinson St
The Water St Medical Clinic
Simcoe ON N3Y 1W4
Phone: 519-428-4676
Fax: 519-428-1982
Address: 32 Robinson St
The Simcoe RAAM Clinic
Simcoe ON N3Y 1W4
Phone: 519-758-0008
Fax: 226-401-3818
Address: The St Paul St Clinic
7 Welland St
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 2L8
Phone: (905) 684-2777
Fax: (905) 684-2776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P.S. Bahra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bahra (CPSO#: 62384 )
Business Address: Suite 2
753 2nd Line
Ohsweken Ontario N0A 1M0
Business Address: 7 Welland Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2R 2L8
Business Address: The Colborne Street Clinic
347 Colborne Street
Suite 1 and 3
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
(519) 754-2893
Business Address: The Water Street Clinic
80 Norfork Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 2W2
(519) 428-4676

Corporation Name: Dr. Parminder Bahra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Colborne St Clinic
347 Colborne St
Brantford Ontario N3S 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 754-2893
Fax: (519) 758-0182
Address: The Brantford RAAM Clinic
2-347 Colborne St E
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
Phone: 519-758-0008
Fax: 226-401-3818
Address: 324 Colborne St
The Brantford RAAM Clinic
Brantford ON N3S 3M9
Phone: 519-758-0008
Fax: 226-401-3818
Address: 324 Colborne St
The Colborne St Clinic
Brantford ON N3S 3M9
Phone: 519-754-2893
Fax: 519-758-0182
Address: The Broad St Clinic
2nd Fl, 140 Broad St East
Dunnville Ontario N1A 1E9
Phone: 289-738-0777
Fax: 289-738-0779
Address: The New Hope Clinic
2-753 2nd Line
Ohsweken Ontario N0A 1M0
Phone: 519-445-1744
Fax: 519-445-4587
Address: The Water Street Clinic
80 Norfolk St S
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 2W2
Phone: (519) 428-4676
Fax: (519) 428-1982
Address: 32 Robinson St
The Water St Medical Clinic
Simcoe ON N3Y 1W4
Phone: 519-428-4676
Fax: 519-428-1982
Address: 32 Robinson St
The Simcoe RAAM Clinic
Simcoe ON N3Y 1W4
Phone: 519-758-0008
Fax: 226-401-3818
Address: The St Paul St Clinic
7 Welland St
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 2L8
Phone: (905) 684-2777
Fax: (905) 684-2776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P.S. Bahra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bahra (CPSO#: 62384 )
Business Address: Suite 2
753 2nd Line
Ohsweken Ontario N0A 1M0
Business Address: 7 Welland Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2R 2L8
Business Address: The Colborne Street Clinic
347 Colborne Street
Suite 1 and 3
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
(519) 754-2893
Business Address: The Water Street Clinic
80 Norfork Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 2W2
(519) 428-4676

Corporation Name: Dr. Parminder Bahra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2014

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARMINDER SINGH BAHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARMINDER SINGH BAHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990