THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K0J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: 613-344-1203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Murphy (CPSO#: 62388 )
Business Address: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
(613) 344-1202

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K0J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: 613-344-1203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Murphy (CPSO#: 62388 )
Business Address: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
(613) 344-1202

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY NEIL MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY NEIL MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990