THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:28:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 199 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 921-7546
Fax: (416) 921-8603

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 29 Aug 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor M. Born Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Born (CPSO#: 62406 )
Business Address: 199 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
(416) 921-7546

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 199 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 921-7546
Fax: (416) 921-8603

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 29 Aug 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor M. Born Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Born (CPSO#: 62406 )
Business Address: 199 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3
(416) 921-7546

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR MASON BORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR MASON BORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990