THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:51:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
34 Kern Road
North York Ontario M3B 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-9902
Fax: (416) 445-9692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pervez S. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ali (CPSO#: 62414 )
Business Address: Unit 5
34 Kern Road
North York Ontario M3B 1T1
(416) 495-9902

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
34 Kern Road
North York Ontario M3B 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-9902
Fax: (416) 445-9692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pervez S. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ali (CPSO#: 62414 )
Business Address: Unit 5
34 Kern Road
North York Ontario M3B 1T1
(416) 495-9902

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PERVEZ SYED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PERVEZ SYED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990