THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:39:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronnie Aronson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aronson (CPSO#: 62417 )
Business Address: Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronnie Aronson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aronson (CPSO#: 62417 )
Business Address: Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONNIE ARONSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARONSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONNIE ARONSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARONSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990