THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:46:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 214
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-8665
Fax: (905) 832-8495

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grace Liu Chua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chua (CPSO#: 62424 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 214
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-8665
Fax: (905) 832-8495

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grace Liu Chua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chua (CPSO#: 62424 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRACE LIU CHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRACE LIU CHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990