THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:31:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2888 Bathurst St
Second Floor
North York ON M6B 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-630-3614
Fax: 416-479-3855

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ages Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ages (CPSO#: 62442 )
Business Address: 770 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6A 3C6
(416) 256-9642
Business Address: 401-3910 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 5Z3
4166303614

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2888 Bathurst St
Second Floor
North York ON M6B 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-630-3614
Fax: 416-479-3855

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ages Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ages (CPSO#: 62442 )
Business Address: 770 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6A 3C6
(416) 256-9642
Business Address: 401-3910 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 5Z3
4166303614

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEENA ELKA AGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEENA ELKA AGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990